WILTSHIRE YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playing of music by schoolchildren.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 November 1990: Standard registration
- 14 December 2016: Funds received from 1157380 WILTSHIRE YOUTH MARCHING BAND
- W W Y M (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF WILTSHIRE YOUNG MUSICIANS (Previous name)
- WEST WILTSHIRE YOUNG MUSICIANS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WYMT Ltd | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.21k | £43.29k | £47.54k | £87.71k | £85.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.34k | £64.01k | £66.15k | £83.50k | £89.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.17k | £19.56k | £15.66k | £26.59k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN IN CHILDREN, UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 19 YEARS, AN EDUCATION IN, APPRECIATION OF, UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF, AND MAKING AND PERFORMING OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS. THIS IS TO BE ACHIEVED BY THE PROVISION OF REGULAR ENSEMBLE REHEARSALS AND CLASSES LEADING TO THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE SOCIETY WILL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wiltshire Young Musicians
Ashley Road
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
Wiltshire
BA15 1DZ
- Phone:
- 07835764218
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window