THE DOUGLAS KENNEDY MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund, established by the National Council of the English Folk Dance and Song Society, exists to assist members of the general public to travel abroad to present English Folk Dance, music and song and to study the art of folk dance and music from overseas countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 1990: Standard registration
- 05 September 2013: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 05 September 2013: Funds transferred to 305999 ENGLISH FOLK DANCE AND SONG SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £696 | £158 | £128 | £128 | £23 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 29 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 06 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 07 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR ENGLISH FOLK DANCE AND MUSIC BY THE CREATION MAINTENANCE AND FUNDING OF GRANTS BURSARIES SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES TO ENABLE: (1) MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PRESENT ENGLISH FOLK DANCE SONG AND MUSIC AT INTERNATIONAL FESTIVALS AND (2) MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO STUDY THE ART OF FOLK DANCE AND MUSIC FROM OVERSEAS COUNTRIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window