LEWISHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting exists to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Croydon
- Lewisham
Governance
- 24 January 1991: Standard registration
- LEWISHAM MANOR SCOUT DISTRICT (Working name)
- LEWISHAM MANOR DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hedley Jackson | Chair | 22 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael McDermott | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Morgan Gareth Fuller | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Garry Walter Leach | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Taylor | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Simmons | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary McCullough | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN MURPHY | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Wallis | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY HINE | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS ELLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MORRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.14k | £464.20k | £346.48k | £384.14k | £405.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £327.37k | £201.09k | £302.01k | £395.32k | £407.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £79.23k | £23.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH. JANUARY 1912, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS OF 28TH MARCH 1949, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967, AND 19TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Frylands Wood Scout Outdoor Centre
Featherbed Lane
CROYDON
CR0 9AA
- Phone:
- 02086571154
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window