Financial history NATIONAL CENTRE FOR CIRCUS ARTS

Charity number: 1001839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.48m £2.53m £2.67m £3.11m £2.60m
Total expenditure £2.28m £2.55m £2.80m £3.03m £2.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £766.88k £1.45m £426.17k £570.50k £20.31k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.02m £1.81m £1.04m £1.22m £550.05k
Income - Other trading activities £553.11k £106.69k £627.51k £705.63k £666.45k
Income - Charitable activities £909.49k £613.69k £1.00m £1.18m £1.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8 £70 £277 £2.22k £6.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.05m £2.36m £2.49m £2.59m £2.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £227.17k £187.93k £314.08k £34.95k £4.89k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £410.65k £452.20k