THE CAMBERWELL CHOIR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1002667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a music project for children and young people aged 0-18, particularly those who would otherwise find it difficult to access positive and constructive group activities, especially high quality music tuition, which can be expensive and hard to find. We meet on Saturdays during term-time and sessions happen at different times depending on age. It costs just -ú1 per child per week.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £17,022
Total expenditure: £19,350

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 April 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev NICHOLAS PAUL GEORGE Chair 14 July 2002
ALFRED AND DOROTHY SHORNEY MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST GILES CHURCH, CAMBERWELL
Received: On time
CAMBERWELL CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Phyllis McLaughlin Trustee 28 May 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GILES WITH ST. MATTHEW CAMBERWELL
Received: 42 days late
FRIENDS OF ST GILES CHURCH, CAMBERWELL
Received: On time
Doris Avbulimen Trustee 09 June 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GILES WITH ST. MATTHEW CAMBERWELL
Received: 42 days late
FRIENDS OF ST GILES CHURCH, CAMBERWELL
Received: On time
Deborah Dairo Trustee 09 June 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GILES WITH ST. MATTHEW CAMBERWELL
Received: 42 days late
FRIENDS OF ST GILES CHURCH, CAMBERWELL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.85k £10.11k £21.56k £14.63k £17.02k
Total expenditure £14.66k £12.07k £18.05k £16.84k £19.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 01 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 October 2023 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 September 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PARISH OFFICE
81 CAMBERWELL CHURCH STREET
LONDON
SE5 8RB
Phone:
02077034504