ST GILES AND ST GEORGE ASHTEAD TRUST

Charity Number: 1003030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of property for use by St Giles' and St George's Parish, Ashtead.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MALCOLM STUART LEIGHTON Trustee 21 June 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASHTEAD
Received: On time
REHEMA TRUST
Received: On time
Peter Levinsohn Trustee 18 December 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASHTEAD
Received: On time
Mrs J R Mould Trustee 05 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 June 2024 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. GEORGE'S CHRISTIAN CENTRE
BARNETT WOOD LANE
ASHTEAD
KT21 2DA
Phone:
01372813332