Financial history FRIENDS OF HEADLEY HEATH

Charity number: 1003110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £555 £786 £638 £679 £568
Total expenditure £2.79k £269 £393 £1.59k £645
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A