THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME

Charity Number: 1003666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The company's principal activity is the advancement of Christian unity through the activities of the Anglican Centre in Rome.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Italy

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Rev Michael Andrew James Burrows Chair 14 November 2018
FRIENDS OF THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME
Received: On time
Margaret Anne Swinson Trustee 06 February 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW AND ST. JAMES MOSSLEY HILL, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL HOPE UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
ANGLICAN CONSULTATIVE COUNCIL
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN AID
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN AID
Received: On time
FRANCIS NEILSON TRUST FUND
Received: 2 days late
THE CORPORATION OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
Christopher Scott Wells Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Bishop Anthony Poggo Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Suk Yee Hon Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Rev James Hawkey Trustee 30 April 2020
None on record
LOUISA MOJELA Trustee 30 April 2020
None on record
THE VENERABLE WILLIAM JONATHAN ADAM Trustee 30 April 2020
ST AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL
Recently registered
CANTERBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE KING'S SCHOOL OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CANTERBURY
Received: On time
JESUS HOSPITAL
Received: On time
KENT WORKPLACE MISSION
Received: On time
The Social Justice Network
Received: On time
The Most Revd Dr Philip Leslie Freier Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Rev KURT H DUNKLE Trustee 11 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £466.34k £175.18k £407.44k £275.91k £948.12k
Total expenditure £340.73k £275.70k £296.28k £325.73k £398.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £936.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.84k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £378.58k
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.08k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £557.63k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £383.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.71k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.71k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £156.64k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £839.29k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £57.20k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 January 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 January 2024 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2023 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 June 2023 241 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Anglican Centre in Rome
St. Andrews House
16 Tavistock Crescent
LONDON
W11 1AP
Phone:
02078981474