THE KELSTON VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is set up to Promote Arts/culture & Sport/recreation through the provision of buildings/facilities and open space and to make this easily accessible for the community and surrounding neighborhood of Kelston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 07 August 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Robert Bryer | Chair | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Frederick Cullimore | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Xavier Pierre-Jean Ficquet | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ian Edwards | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Waters | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Alexander John Creed | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PAYNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £11.97k | £24.84k | £5.01k | £8.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.45k | £4.54k | £2.33k | £2.60k | £2.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £19.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 5 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF KELSTON IN THE COUNTY OF AVON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISH OF KELSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Mill Farm Barn
Kelston
BATH
BA1 9AQ
- Phone:
- 07531184152
- Email:
- stephenm.constant@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window