THE CASTOR CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 15 August 1991: Standard registration
- 31 August 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 31 August 2011: Funds transferred to 267469 THE CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £1.47k | £1.55k | £1.80k | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £924 | £24 | £24 | £1.52k | £24 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 24 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 09 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 29TH APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
(1)IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL AT MILLFIELD AND THE MAINTENANCE OF SERVICES THEREIN. (2)IF AND INSOFAR AS INCOME IN ANY YEAR IS NOT APPLICABLE IN MANNER AFORESAID THE SAME MAY BE APPLIED IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF ANY CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE MAINTENANCE OF SERVICES THEREIN.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window