FRIENDS OF SOUTH PETHERTON ( CHURCH OF ENGLAND ) INFANTS' SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1004478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support for the Governors and raising funds to enhance the School's activities including teaching staff availability

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,478
Total expenditure: £2,090

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF THE INFANT SCHOOL (Working name)
  • SOUTH PETHERTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED INFANTS SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shan Weston Trustee 01 September 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH PETHERTON WITH THE SEAVINGTONS AND THE LAMBROOKS
Received: 102 days late
Rosemary Bennett Trustee 25 November 2015
None on record
Anne Lewis Trustee 25 November 2015
None on record
ROBIN MEIKLEJOHN BALLARD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £852 £633 £518 £5.77k £1.48k
Total expenditure £2.37k £2.33k £4.27k £885 £2.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Church Path
Hele Lane
South Petherton
South Petherton
Somerset
TA19 9DA
Phone:
01460240750
Website:

southpethertoncofeinfants.co.uk