Financial history CHEDWORTH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1005512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.97k £2.42k £1.21k £2.11k £2.92k
Total expenditure £1.15k £1.89k £2.54k £2.32k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A