SELBY GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding Selby Central District is part of Girlguiding UK and as such is part of a worldwide movement which enables girls and young women to fulfil their potential to take an active and responsible role in society through its distinctive, stimulating and enjoyable programme delivered by trained volunteer leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 November 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL ANN FENTEMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Heather Wiles | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MRS A CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
LINDA MOORE | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
RUTH EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CAROLE ANDREA WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROSEMARY SENIOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.81k | £1.26k | £1.25k | £1.39k | £1.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £200 | £3.41k | £429 | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 January 2021 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Commonside Farm
Common Road
Barlow
SELBY
YO8 8JF
- Phone:
- 000000000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window