THE NOTTINGHAM EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1006495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of The Nottingham Education Trust is advance the education of young people, under the age of 21 and permanently resident in the City of Nottingham to pursue activities outside of their formal education, particularly in Music & the Arts, the Sciences, Languages, Travel & Cultural Experience, Sports & Outdoor & Adventurous pursuits, who would otherwise not have the opportunity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £25,707
Total expenditure: £23,025

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NOTTINGHAM DERBY ROAD BRITISH SCHOOL EXHIBITION FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Stephen Stewart Chair 05 August 2019
FUNDAYS IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Received: On time
OAK FIELD SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
OAK FIELD OLD STUDENT ASSOCIATION CIO
Received: On time
YOUNG CREATIVES NOTTINGHAM
Received: 66 days late
Councillor Samina Riaz Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Gary Fullwood Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
Councillor Audrey Dinnall Trustee 14 December 2022
None on record
Linda Margaret Abbott Trustee 29 September 2022
ONE VISION PARTNERSHIP LIMITED
Received: On time
REBALANCING THE OUTER ESTATES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Councillor Cheryl Margaret Barnard Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record
Councillor Jay Hayes Trustee 16 July 2019
None on record
Dr KADIATU GWYNETH KANNEH Trustee 10 January 2019
None on record
BENJAMIN KING Trustee 14 January 2016
None on record
Hon Alderman GILL HAYMES Trustee 01 January 2010
None on record
Councillor DAVID MELLEN Trustee 12 May 2007
BAKERSFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
NEW LIFE BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NEW LIFE BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
NOTTINGHAM IMAGINATION LIBRARY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.34k £47.65k £22.83k £24.61k £25.71k
Total expenditure £19.36k £76.57k £54.56k £16.05k £23.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o NCC Post Room
Loxley House
Station Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 3NG
Phone:
07972112174