Financial history ST MARYCHURCH PRECINCT CENTRE

Charity Number: 1006956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.85k £4.23k £24.28k £33.34k £32.37k
Total expenditure £15.46k £17.21k £14.25k £17.60k £15.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £100 £100 N/A