CROSSWAYS COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help people who experience enduring mental health difficulties. Accommodation is available for up to 40 people mainly through our registered care home, hostel & independent living flats in Tunbridge Wells. We offer person-centred care and our residents are encouraged through their support workers to take responsibility for their own lives with a view to moving back into the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£1,866,298
Donations and legacies | £19.17k | |
Charitable activities | £1.74m | |
Other trading activities | £64.55k | |
Investments | £44.18k | |
Other | £330 |
Total expenditure:
£2,179,821
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.14m | |
Other | £37.91k |
-£1,582 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,656,285 from 11 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £37.91k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.14m |
People

51 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 08 January 1992: Standard registration
- 02 February 2023: Funds received from 1038726 MENTAL HEALTH RESIDENTIAL LIMITED
- CROSSWAYS (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Kirk | Chair | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monique London | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Nicole Ruth Averill | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Nigel Weatherseed | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Ridge Davis | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy May Perkins | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.88m | £2.97m | £2.30m | £2.05m | £1.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63m | £1.91m | £2.00m | £2.15m | £2.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.63m | £1.81m | £1.94m | £1.84m | £1.66m | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £55.14k | £50.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £21.70k | £30.31k | £16.49k | £17.82k | £19.17k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £48.99k | £287 | £46.61k | £60.11k | £64.55k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.74m | £1.93m | £2.18m | £1.96m | £1.74m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.17k | £26.28k | £3.91k | £9.61k | £44.18k | |
|
Income - Other | £60.59k | £988.48k | £52.80k | £1.30k | £330 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.62m | £1.91m | £1.98m | £2.12m | £2.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £8.34k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.70k | £12.29k | £29.01k | £16.46k | £18.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £123 | £17.23k | £23.37k | £37.91k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.53m | £2.89m | £3.11m | £7.50m | £7.41m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £1.02m | £1.77m | £1.87m | £1.93m | £1.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £85.43k | £135.31k | £148.56k | £174.23k | £192.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 12TH SEPTEMBER 2002 as amended on 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
To relieve sickness and to preserve the health of people suffering from poor mental health of any description or in need of rehabilitation as a result of such poor health by the provision of all appropriate means including (but not limited to) accommodation, equipment, facilities for work or recreation, treatment, support, care, counselling, education, training and practical advice. To advance the education of the public in mental health by the provision of all appropriate means including (but not limited to) information, teaching, seminars, support, care, counselling, advocacy, campaigning and practical advice. To advance the Protestant and Evangelical faith To deliver these objects as a response to the love of God and the example of Jesus Christ.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crossways Community
Administration Building
8 Culverden Park Road
Tunbridge Wells
TN4 9QX
- Phone:
- 01892543290
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window