MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The improvement, enhancement and major refurbishment of Manchester Cathedral, its fabric and grounds and the provision of new facilities and equipment of general benefit to Manchester Cathedral and the community served by Manchester Cathedral.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 13 February 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reverend Canon Dr Ian Jorysz | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
CANON PHILIP STEEL BLINKHORN | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Marion Elizabeth McClintock MBE, BA | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Robert Eric Hough CBE DL LLB | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Robert Allinson | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
PHILIP DEAKIN | Trustee | 19 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
THE VERY REVEREND ROGERS MORGAN GOVENDER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.66k | £158.75k | £45.33k | £6.17k | £13.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £8.52k | £60.81k | £9.49k | £38.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 December 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 December 2020 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
IMPROVEMENT,ENHANCEMENT AND MAJOR REFURBISHMENT OF MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL ITS FABRIC AND GROUND, AND ANY OTHER LAND OWNED BY OR LEASED TO THE TRUST,AND THE PROVISION OF NEW FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT OF GENERAL BENEFIT TO MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL AND THE COMMUNITY SERVED BY MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL. FOR FURTHER INFORMATION PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL AND THE COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL
VICTORIA STREET
MANCHESTER
M3 1SX
- Phone:
- 01618332220
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window