STOCKPORT, EAST CHESHIRE, HIGH PEAK, URMSTON & DISTRICT CEREBRAL PALSY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1009768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports children and adults who have physical and/or learning disabilities with priority being given to those with the most severe disabilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Derbyshire
  • Manchester City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 March 1992: Standard registration
  • 17 February 2017: Funds received from 509064 URMSTON & DISTRICT SCOPE
  • 04 May 2017: Funds received from 513740 PRIMFAD (PROVISION OF IMPROVED FACILITIES FOR THE ...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Supportability (Working name)
  • STOCKPORT EAST CHESHIRE AND HIGH PEAK CEREBRAL PALSY SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • STOCKPORT EAST CHESHIRE AND HIGH PEAK SPASTICS SOCIETY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT THOMAS MAXWELL ARMSTRONG Chair 12 December 2018
None on record
JONATHAN BLOOM Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Roberts Trustee 15 December 2021
CHRISTIAN LIFE FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
THE ELIZABETH CASSON TRUST
Received: 12 days late
Rory Vaughn Alkin Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
NATALIE GRACE HINCHCLIFFE Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
MICHAEL FRANCIS BAILEY Trustee 15 December 2010
None on record
ROY MALCOLM DUDLEY-SOUTHERN Trustee 17 November 2010
TARN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Maria Repanos Trustee 21 January 2009
STOCKPORT WOMENS CENTRE
Received: On time
NICOLE GUY Trustee 20 July 2005
GREATER MANCHESTER WOMEN'S SUPPORT ALLIANCE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.42m £3.76m £3.53m £3.66m £3.96m
Total expenditure £3.57m £3.24m £3.25m £3.63m £3.86m
Income from government contracts £2.03m £2.36m £2.26m £2.44m £2.62m
Income from government grants N/A £499.11k £88.07k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £65.42k £47.89k £14.50k £19.40k £32.38k
Income - Other trading activities £45.61k £10.48k £22.25k £14.42k £24.76k
Income - Charitable activities £3.30m £3.70m £3.49m £3.61m £3.87m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.57k £288 £131 £9.27k £30.41k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £12.30k £0 £0 £0 £912
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.46m £3.15m £3.20m £3.55m £3.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £100.14k £58.81k £41.03k £43.81k £67.94k
Expenditure - Governance £12.90k £11.59k £14.41k £15.74k £13.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.27k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £12.50k £31.42k £12.28k £36.09k £154.35k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.15m £1.12m £1.09m £1.71m £1.02m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £706.68k
Other assets £1.04m £1.73m £2.16m £1.55m £1.86m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £278.39k £420.16k £550.74k £524.13k £691.34k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Granville House
20 Parsonage Road
Heaton Moor
Stockport
Cheshire
SK4 4JZ
Phone:
01614321248