Financial history WILDLIFE RESEARCH AND MANAGEMENT TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1010383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.54k £3.52k £3.89k £4.46k £5.53k
Total expenditure £8.65k £8.88k £9.32k £546 £9.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A