JOHN STUART MILL INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Institute sponsors lectures and publications on current affairs issues in line with its founding principles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOCTOR ALAN BUTT PHILIP | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Ian William Falcao MacFadyen | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID WARD | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Dr Seth Robin Alexander Thevoz | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
MAUREEN NOLAN | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Christine Joan Willmore | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Mohammed Javed Bashir | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ANN MOORE DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Michael James Meadowcroft | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Arthur GORDON LISHMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £0 | £500 | £228 | £864 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £45 | £4.04k | £509 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SOCIAL ECONOMIC AND INTERNATIONAL AFFAIRS IN PARTICULAR AS THEY RELATE TO THE RIGHTS OF INDIVIDUALS THE ENVIRONMENT AND COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Meadow Road
BROMLEY
BR2 0DX
- Phone:
- 07788746995
- Email:
- maureen@mnolan.co.uk
- Website:
-
jsmillinstitute.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window