STAPLES TRUST

Charity Number: 1010656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £415,347
Total expenditure: £505,168

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Austria
  • Bangladesh
  • France
  • Italy
  • Netherlands
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE JESSICA SAINSBURY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JESSICA MARY SAINSBURY Chair 31 March 1992
SURVIVAL INTERNATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE TEDWORTH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ALAN AND BABETTE SAINSBURY CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
Professor PETER FRANKOPAN Trustee 31 October 1997
THE JERUSALEM TRUST
Received: On time
TIMOTHY JAMES SAINSBURY Trustee 20 January 1994
THE VOICES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE RESURGENCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HEADLEY TRUST
Received: On time
THE KAY KENDALL LEUKAEMIA FUND
Received: On time
THE TEDWORTH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £423.73k £322.79k £263.29k £300.75k £415.35k
Total expenditure £802.39k £453.31k £514.92k £604.95k £505.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PEAK
5 WILTON ROAD
LONDON
SW1V 1AP
Phone:
02074100330