Financial history Outdoor development ministries

Charity number: 1012007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £62.51k £36.85k £128.00k £69.61k £37.59k
Total expenditure £38.54k £40.35k £105.33k £49.55k £50.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A