OSPREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising through events eg dinner dances, speakers, golf and other social occasions and by donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 30 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A C WARNEKEN-GOLD | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Maxine Osgerby | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID HAIRE | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||||
Christina Mary Wood | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
WILLIAM WADDINGTON | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
DEBBIE CHETHAM-SUTTON | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
DR S STEEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Syd HOWEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COLIN ENGLISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Marilyn CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
S ENGLISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Vanessa CHETHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.17k | £22.76k | £34.67k | £26.52k | £32.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.28k | £10.54k | £11.03k | £12.51k | £13.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
1) THE PURCHASE OF A BONE DENSITOMETER AND OTHER APPARATUS OR EQUIPMENT, MEDICAL OR OTHERWISE REQUIRED FOR USE IN INVESTIGATING OR TREATING THE CONDITION OF OR ALLEVIATING THE SUFFERING OF OR FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESEARCH LEADING TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL SCIENCE IN THE FIELD OF OSTEOPOROSIS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ANY PERSON ENGAGED IN THE FIELD OF OSTEOPOROSIS. 3) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH LEADING TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL SCIENCE IN THE FIELD OF OSTEOPOROSIS GENERALLY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE NORTH AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE)
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o A.C Warneken Gold
Riga House
Humber Road
North Ferriby
HU14 3DW
- Phone:
- 01482849501
- Email:
- howey@howey.karoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window