HANDICAPPED CHILDRENS ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide items of specialist equipment for children with disabilities, learning difficulties and other special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARTHUR CHARLES CAUSTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joshua Zunde | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPER VINCENT MSC BA PGCE MCGI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.76k | £248.97k | £249.07k | £357.28k | £370.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.20k | £285.85k | £271.76k | £296.06k | £364.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN,IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ELECTRIC TURBO WHEELCHAIRS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 7 Cleethorpes Business Centre
Jackson Place
Humberston
GRIMSBY
DN36 4AS
- Phone:
- 01472813000
- Email:
- ca.davies110@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window