Financial history CUMNOR GARDENING CLUB

Charity number: 1016235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 02/03/2021 02/03/2022 02/03/2023 02/03/2024
Total gross income £8.14k £928 £522 £3.54k £728
Total expenditure £7.30k £825 £644 £3.71k £1.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A