Financial history PRESIDENTS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1017310
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £1.13m £783 £47 £0 £0
Total expenditure £660.96k £467.20k £234.33k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.13m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £330 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £86.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £574.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £14.40k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A