NEWARK EMMAUS TRUST

Charity number: 1017344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve, mitigate and prevent poverty suffering and distress. To relieve in cases of need hardship or distress young persons who are homeless or likely to become homeless, provide or assist directly or indirectly in the provision of temporary accommodation for homeless young persons in the town of Newark-on-Trent, in the County of Nottinghamshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES HOWLETT Chair
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: 16 days late
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Adrian John Down Trustee 23 September 2014
None on record
Emma Elizabeth Fulcher Trustee 13 February 2014
None on record
SARA MARGARET GILBERT Trustee 11 September 2013
Sir Donald Wolfit Charitable Trust
Received: On time
CHRISTINE ROSE Trustee 09 November 2012
None on record
JEREMY DAVID BLATHERWICK Trustee
None on record
RICHARD HAIG Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £751.95k £748.61k £772.14k £740.82k £812.85k
Total expenditure £695.27k £687.25k £727.24k £792.96k £757.16k
Income from government contracts £8.15k £968 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.90k £500 £40.74k £12.69k £10.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £56.56k £83.65k £42.74k £32.39k £22.76k
Income - Other trading activities £1.39k £624 £5.91k £16.73k £38.55k
Income - Charitable activities £691.73k £661.77k £722.22k £687.82k £746.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.28k £2.57k £1.27k £3.88k £4.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £68.43k £4.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £695.25k £686.96k £726.71k £779.32k £744.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £25 £296 £529 £13.64k £13.07k
Expenditure - Governance £5.01k £3.83k £6.07k £4.58k £1.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.29m £1.25m £1.23m £1.19m £1.25m
Long-term investments £166.00k £81.40k £157.28k £158.96k £156.38k
Other assets £422.18k £613.72k £693.73k £720.84k £694.95k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£983.00k -£1.31m -£1.08m -£152.00k -£76.00k
Total liabilities £32.67k £26.70k £86.32k £69.94k £37.25k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 Northgate
Newark
Notts
NG24 1HD
Phone:
01636700883