TYNESIDE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society organises ten lectures each year on the decorative and fine arts. It has a church recorders group whose researches produce records of the fabric and contents of churches for presentation. Volunteers assist museums and other institutions with the cataloguing and maintenance of heritage property. The society makes grants to support arts projects in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 01 March 1993: Standard registration
- TYDFAS (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Fletcher | Chair | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LALIK NASMYTH | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wood | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ging | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Grant | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Gregory | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Vivienne Molyneux | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Kerr | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gill | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE YOUNG | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND ELAINE SHARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN KIDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARION JEAN ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.51k | £11.79k | £6.33k | £6.33k | £8.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.49k | £8.86k | £6.35k | £6.35k | £10.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 8 FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS, AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE CONSERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Roseworth Crescent
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1NR
- Phone:
- 0191 2858067
- Email:
- Ianfletcher2@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window