Financial history WINDMILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1018154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.69k £258 £1.45k £2.91k £2.59k
Total expenditure £2.75k £488 £1.73k £2.21k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A