Financial history THE BETLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1018686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.27k £1.84k £3.89k £3.97k £4.25k
Total expenditure £800 £750 £2.10k £1.85k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A