HALLOW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1019143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

EDUCATION, RECREATION,and all appertaining to those subjects

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £1,848
Total expenditure: £1,184

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEANETTE RIDDEX Chair
None on record
GWENDOLINE COUNSELL Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
ALISON O'HARA Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
ROSEMARY THOM Trustee 13 October 2015
None on record
MONICA SMITH Trustee 13 October 2015
None on record
PAULINE JENKINS Trustee 08 October 2015
None on record
DINAH GWILLIAM Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.92k £827 £1.45k £1.55k £1.85k
Total expenditure £2.69k £788 £1.77k £2.09k £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 February 2025 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 February 2025 602 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 February 2025 967 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 OMBERSLEY ROAD
WORCESTER
WR3 7BW
Phone:
01905610396
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available