Financial history HALIFAX CHORAL SOCIETY (1817) LIMITED

Charity number: 1020049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £31.31k £19.40k £26.76k £24.27k £30.18k
Total expenditure £46.57k £11.07k £28.65k £15.14k £30.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A