PERSERVERANCE (ALL SAINTS) NORTH HILLINGDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1020129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting as part of the Scout Association www.scouts.org.uk. Provision of a community hall for use by others. Currently Managed by Hillingdon West Scout District Charity number 1026901

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennipher Marshall-Jenkinson Chair 30 March 2023
1ST HILLINGDON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
ALAN STACK Trustee 30 November 2023
THE SOCIETY OF DAIRY TECHNOLOGY
Received: On time
8TH HAYES SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Hillingdon West District Scout Council
Received: On time
1ST HILLINGDON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Georgia Miller Trustee 30 March 2023
1ST HILLINGDON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.62k £40.66k £32.33k £32.20k £0
Total expenditure £11.18k £15.12k £10.53k £10.53k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.29k £18.40k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2022 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Scout Hut
118 Sweetcroft Lane
uxbridge
middlesx
UB10 9LQ
Phone:
07957147241