HILLTOP WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Speakers to Meetings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Turnbull | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Quin | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Staiano | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Milne | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christina Anne Shea | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN HILARY MARSH | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Denise Burton | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY DEACON | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70k | £1.31k | £1.26k | £1.98k | £2.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £1.60k | £1.64k | £1.77k | £2.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TURNER'S HILL, EAST GRINSTEAD, FELBRIDGE, CRAWLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring Meadow
Green Lane, Snow Hill
Crawley Down
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
RH10 3ED
- Phone:
- 01342 715303
- Email:
- mail@marydeacon.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window