Financial history GREENMOUNT VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1021778
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £59.08k £54.55k £60.65k £43.74k £32.66k
Total expenditure £57.86k £51.16k £45.33k £44.83k £34.76k
Income from government contracts N/A £28.62k £28.68k £25.66k £2.55k
Income from government grants £747 N/A £2.04k £1.46k N/A