Financial history Silverton Community Hall

Charity Number: 1022138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £28.37k £22.01k £24.82k £22.11k £23.72k
Total expenditure £13.05k £36.74k £13.62k £62.79k £28.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £11.43k £8.00k £2.00k N/A