Trustees CROWBOROUGH DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1022405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANGELA RUTH REED Chair
None on record
Elizabeth Thacker Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
CHLOE MCCARTHY Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Tina O'Callaghan Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Caroline Norman Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Hannah Williams Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Lauren Mayo Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Sarah Brown Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Lucy Corke Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Claire Steen Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Rebecca Hughes Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Natalie Coates Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Victoria Brookes Trustee 25 February 2016
None on record
CALANTHA NEWBY Trustee 06 October 2015
None on record
JESSICA SMALL Trustee 06 October 2015
None on record
SUZANNE HEMSLEY Trustee 06 October 2015
None on record
FREYA WILLIAMS Trustee 21 September 2013
None on record
KAREN KILBY Trustee
None on record
MR E N PANTON Trustee
None on record
LAURA CLARK Trustee
None on record