JEWISH GENEALOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises lectures, seminars and workshops for members and the public. Publishes guides to the study of Jewish Genealogy available to all, a journal (Shemot) and newsletter. Operates a library open to all by arrangement. Promotes research into Jewish family history. Provides websites open to all containing details of more than 1000 Jewish communities in Great Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Dworkin | Chair | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Justin Mendoza | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Segal | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Leonie Whitehead | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Sharon Hintze | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|||||
LYDIA COLLINS | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER HEILBRUNN | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Rosenthal | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David Siederer | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Marie-Anne Gilberte Knight | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Maurice Harris | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA FEINSTEIN | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marcus | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.51k | £37.98k | £22.60k | £21.75k | £21.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.90k | £14.09k | £22.16k | £17.79k | £18.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2001 AS AMENDED ON 26 OCT 2003 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 15 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2021 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO JEWISH GENEALOGY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 922
Amersham
HP6 9JG
- Phone:
- 07887484570
- Email:
- enquiries@jgsgb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window