Financial history FOLKESTONE LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1022816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.49k £1.53k £13.62k £14.80k £13.65k
Total expenditure £8.38k £5.17k £8.39k £14.89k £15.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A