ULEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of Village Hall facilities for the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOEL ANTHONY BRISCOE | Chair | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Frances Chillingworth | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erica Mary Fawcus Gibbs | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Dawn Mason-Fayle | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Winona Jane Rushton | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stephen Paul Walsh | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN DAVIS | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr David Rolfe Lungley | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Charles James Kirk | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE ANNE KIRK | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maria Ball | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELIZABETH WOOD | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Uley Parish Council | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.03k | £19.70k | £24.44k | £14.89k | £10.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.90k | £7.04k | £11.97k | £41.87k | £10.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £10.00k | £19.17k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 September 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 21ST APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ULEY IN THE COUNTY AND DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ULEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Whitecourt
Uley
DURSLEY
GL11 5TG
- Phone:
- 000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window