Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH DITCHLING

Charity number: 1024889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.67k £14.13k £23.40k £32.55k £14.82k
Total expenditure £13.04k £0 £7.49k £4.06k £7.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A