WILTSHIRE SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting actively engages and supports young people in their personal development empowering them to make a positive contribution to society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1960 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 August 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUSTIN PURKIS | Chair | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Roberts | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Skerrett Holmes | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Thomas John Dobson | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Mollie Nevill | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Bavister | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Leonard Waspe | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Stephen Maurice Barley | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER FREDERICK REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.13k | £77.25k | £50.25k | £103.12k | £218.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.43k | £48.24k | £56.73k | £118.41k | £285.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.36k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wiltshire County Scout Centre
Potterne Wick
Potterne
DEVIZES
Wiltshire
SN10 5QT
- Phone:
- 01249248516
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window