Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF OTTER VALLEY TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1025672
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 May 2025 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 16 May 2025 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 09 May 2025 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required