Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF OTTER VALLEY TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1025672
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.86k £9.03k £35.46k £21.18k £28.19k
Total expenditure £21.37k £8.04k £32.72k £28.14k £26.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £21.18k N/A