DRESDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dresden Trust builds bridges of friendship and cooperation between the people of Britain and Dresden following the destruction of the historic centre by British bombing in 1945. Having pursued reconciliation in the 30 years since its foundation, the Trust cooperates with Dresden in school exchanges, youth learning projects, culture, conferences and enhancement of public spaces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sinclair Mckay | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Findlay | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Schieferdecker | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruediger Goerner | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stocker | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Marcus Ferrar | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £935 | £10.20k | £2.55k | £50 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £785 | £3.84k | £2.79k | £9.14k | £7.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 AUGUST 1993, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 5 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE RESTORATION OF THE CHURCH OF OUR LADY IN DRESDEN AND THEREBY THE REMEMBRANCE OF THE VICTIMS OF AERIAL BOMBARDMENT; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE CITIZENS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN GERMAN ART, ARCHITECTURE, HISTORY, MUSIC, LITERATURE AND SCIENCE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE OT DRESDEN/SAXONY; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF GERMAN CITIZENS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF DRESDEN/SAXONY, IN THE ART, ARCHITECTURE, HISTORY , MUSIC, LITERATURE AND SCIENCE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 CAPEL CLOSE
OXFORD
OX2 7LA
- Phone:
- 07584 199488
- Email:
- INFO@DRESDENTRUST.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window