Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BURY ST EDMUNDS CHARITY FUND

Charity Number: 1026392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £463 £362 £531 £823 £2.15k
Total expenditure £456 £360 £160 £258 £2.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A