Financial history RLUK (RESEARCH LIBRARIES UK)

Charity number: 1026543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £411.54k £530.60k £595.85k £770.37k £414.87k
Total expenditure £430.49k £380.20k £585.73k £631.88k £459.69k
Income from government contracts N/A £101.63k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £200.00k £350.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £347.21k £347.21k £365.98k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £183.34k £248.06k £398.15k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £54 £586 £6.24k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £380.20k £585.73k £631.88k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.05k £11.20k £11.68k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £194.13k £218.79k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A