Trustees RLUK (RESEARCH LIBRARIES UK)

Charity number: 1026543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Louise Harvell Chair 19 March 2021
THE MASS OBSERVATION ARCHIVE
Received: On time
Christopher Bruce Cipkin Trustee 19 March 2025
M25 CONSORTIUM OF ACADEMIC LIBRARIES
Received: On time
Wendy Heather White Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Dr Catriona Cannon Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
James Gordon Anthony-Edwards Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Dr Catherine Teresa Eagleton Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Edmund James Thomas Fay Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Kirsty Lingstadt Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Catherine Louise Price Trustee 19 March 2021
None on record
Jeremy Charles Upton Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record