Financial history 1ST STOKE CLIMSLAND SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1026915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.44k £24.84k £38.53k £23.51k £24.61k
Total expenditure £30.97k £15.00k £22.07k £23.98k £22.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.35k N/A £10.83k N/A N/A