MALONE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1027048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Malone Society is named after Edmond Malone, the editor of the first variorum edition of Shakespeare. Since its foundation in 1906, its purpose has been to make more accessible the materials essential for the study of English Renaissance drama. Its publications are renowned for their meticulous scholarship and high standard of accuracy, and are indispensable to students of early drama.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £15,545
Total expenditure: £19,374

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Canada
  • Japan
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 October 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof. Siobhan Christine Keenan Chair 07 November 2012
None on record
Dr Maria Shmygol Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Paul Mark Cunningham Trustee 04 February 2023
None on record
Dr Simon Christopher Smith Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Dr Harry Rennells McCarthy Trustee 03 January 2022
None on record
Dr Eleanor Collins Trustee 01 February 2020
None on record
Dr JOSE PEREZ DIEZ Trustee 02 June 2018
None on record
Dr Lucy Munro Trustee 15 June 2014
None on record
Dr Eleanor Lowe Trustee 15 June 2014
None on record
Professor Henry Woudhuysen FBA Trustee
None on record
Prof. George Richard Proudfoot Trustee
None on record
Leah Scragg Trustee
None on record
Professor Catherine Teresa Richardson Trustee
THE FORUM TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Katharine Craik Trustee
None on record
Dr Martin Wiggins Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.96k £6.19k £9.63k £10.03k £15.55k
Total expenditure £31.54k £15.69k £13.07k £20.23k £19.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 03 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Heatherville
Crumps Brook
Hopton Wafers
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY14 0HS
Phone:
07983027660